Insiders | Shares | % | Avg Price | Total $ | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Buys | 0 | ||||
Sells | 2 | -4.9K | 100% | $116.40 | -$570K |
Net | -2 | -4.9K | -100% | -$570K |
Name | Relationship | Holdings Value | Past Year Net Change | Change % | Report Date |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victor L. Richey Jr | Retired Director & Exec Chair | $30.1M | Jun 30, 2023 | ||
Leon J. Olivier | Director | $8.02M | -$90.2K | -1.11% | Jul 19, 2024 |
Robert J. Phillippy | Director | $5.37M | Jul 19, 2024 | ||
James M. Stolze | Director | $4.68M | Feb 6, 2024 | ||
Patrick M. Dewar | Director | $4.5M | Jul 19, 2024 | ||
Bryan H. Sayler | CEO & President, Director | $3.33M | Nov 14, 2023 | ||
Vinod M. Khilnani | Director | $3.01M | -$480K | -13.8% | Aug 20, 2024 |
David M. Schatz | Sr. VP, Sec'y & Gen. Counsel | $2.45M | Nov 14, 2023 | ||
Larry W. Solley | Director | $2.44M | Jan 4, 2022 | ||
Gloria L. Valdez | Director | $2.36M | Jul 19, 2024 | ||
Christopher L. Tucker | Sr. Vice President & CFO | $2M | Nov 14, 2023 | ||
Janice L. Hess | Director | $1.55M | Jul 19, 2024 |
Insider | Symbol | Class | Transaction | % | Value $ | * Price $ | Shares | Shares Owned | Date | Ownership |
---|